Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hunt & Henriques, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Andre L. Verdun, Caesar Hernandez, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2019 |
CategoryNon-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COMPLAINT FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 12/03/2019
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 12/03/2019
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 12/06/2019
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2867068 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-12-06T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, CEASAR ON 09/11/2020
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 09/11/2020.
Date: 2020-09-11T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/21/2020 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-06-15T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 03/11/2020
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 10/09/2020
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00DECLARATION OF MAILING OR OF INABILITY TO ASCERTAIN ADDRESS FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 10/09/2020
Date: 2020-10-09T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/16/2020
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED
Date: 2020-09-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/21/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-10-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 10/26/2020
Date: 2020-10-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 01/08/2021
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/12/2021
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2973728 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3978869 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 02/24/2021
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2981092 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 02/24/2021
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1810287 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY VERDUN, ANDRE L. ON 02/23/2021
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY VERDUN, ANDRE L. ON 02/23/2021
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY VERDUN, ANDRE L. ON 02/23/2021
Date: 2021-02-23T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY VERDUN, ANDRE L. ON 03/05/2021
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 03/16/2021
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, CEASAR ON 03/10/2021
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/17/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 04/12/2021
Date: 2021-04-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 04/15/2021
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/15/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/15/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 04/16/2021
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/15/2021.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY VERDUN, ANDRE L. ON 05/17/2021
Date: May 17, 2021PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/27/2021.
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 01/13/2022
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:0001/19/2022 MINUTE ORDER WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT LIST.
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 03/24/2022
Date: 2022-03-24T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST (FINAL PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST) FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 01/19/2022
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-12-03T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41257357 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OC GENERATED
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/18/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 02/04/2022
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 04/01/2022 09:18:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-01T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 02/04/2022
Date: 2022-02-04T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 01/13/2022
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 12/07/2021
Date: 2021-12-07T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 01/13/2022
Date: 2022-01-13T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY VERDUN, ANDRE L.; HERNANDEZ, CAESAR ON 03/04/2022
Date: 2022-03-04T00:00:00JUDGMENT FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 04/11/2022
Date: April 11, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: April 22, 2022PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/07/2022.
Date: April 07, 2022MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY HUNT & HENRIQUES ON 04/07/2022
Date: April 07, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.