Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Orange County District Attorney filed a(n) Misc Complaints - Other case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2019 |
CategoryMisc Complaints - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF FILED BY PRUETT, SCOTT LESLIE ON 08/28/2020
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00REQUEST FOR EXTENSION TO TIME TO FILE BRIEF FILED BY PRUETT, SCOTT LESLIE ON 06/30/2020
Date: 2020-06-30T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00RECORD ON APPEAL - CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF
Date: 2020-06-10T00:00:00RECORD ON APPEAL - STATEMENT ON APPEAL
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00MINUTES
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING RECORD ON APPEAL AND NOTICE OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER APPELLATE PANEL ON 11/14/2019.
Date: 2019-11-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 07/17/2020 12:55:00 PM.
Date: 2020-07-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 07/07/2020 09:13:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PRUETT, SCOTT LESLIE ON 07/10/2020
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: August 13, 2021CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: June 11, 2021REMOTE HEARING INSTRUCTIONS
Date: March 22, 2021REMITTITUR
Date: August 13, 2021HEARING ON APPEAL - INFRACTION SCHEDULED FOR 04/22/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C01 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE BRIEF
Date: 2020-09-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 06/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: June 11, 2021RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS
Date: August 26, 2021MINUTES FINALIZED FOR HEARING ON APPEAL - INFRACTION 04/22/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: April 22, 2021OPINION FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/11/2021
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF FILING OF JUDGMENT/ORDER
Date: June 11, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.