Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rdi Financial Llc, filed a(n) Civil case against Mark A. Stiffler, Optymyze Llc, Spm Global Services, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 02, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Hearing | Order to show cause re: dismissal for failure to proceed | |
January 05, 2021 | Action | E-filing transaction 41146104 received on 01/05/2021 09:45:22 am. | |
January 05, 2021 | Action | Amended complaint (first) filed by rdi financial llc on 01/05/2021 | |
January 05, 2021 | Action | Civil case cover sheet filed by rdi financial llc on 01/05/2021 | |
January 05, 2021 | Action | Summons issued and filed filed by rdi financial llc on 01/05/2021 | |
October 23, 2020 | Action | Order to show cause re: dismissal for failure to proceed scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30:00 pm in c03 at central justice center. | |
October 23, 2020 | Action | The order to show cause re: dismissal for failure to proceed is scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30 pm in department c03. | |
October 23, 2020 | Action | Minutes finalized for status conference 10/23/2020 09:00:00 am. | |
June 08, 2020 | Action | Status conference scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 09:00:00 am in c03 at central justice center. | |
October 02, 2019 | Action | E-filing transaction 2844051 received on 10/02/2019 10:41:57 am. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.