Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Velocity Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Civil case against Sittiporn Thaitear, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2021 | Hearing | Status conference | |
October 23, 2020 | Action | Status conference scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30:00 pm in c03 at central justice center. | |
October 23, 2020 | Action | Status conference continued to 01/06/2021 at 01:30 pm in this department pursuant to party's motion. | |
October 23, 2020 | Action | Minutes finalized for status conference 10/23/2020 09:00:00 am. | |
July 08, 2020 | Action | E-filing transaction number 1743070 rejected. | |
June 05, 2020 | Action | Status conference scheduled for 10/23/2020 at 09:00:00 am in c03 at central justice center. | |
October 31, 2019 | Action | E-filing transaction 3849785 received on 10/25/2019 04:46:37 pm. | |
October 25, 2019 | Action | Proof of service of summons filed by velocity investments, llc on 10/25/2019 | |
October 01, 2019 | Action | E-filing transaction 1671699 received on 09/30/2019 03:09:23 pm. | |
October 01, 2019 | Action | Payment received by legalconnect for 168 - complaint or other 1st paper >$10k<=$25k in the amount of 370.00, transaction number 12631152 and receipt number 12455676. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.