Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Advantage One Escrow Inc., filed a(n) Civil case against Cheri L Clark Hodgson, Bruce K Hodgson, Eshaqzai Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 05, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Hearing | Order to show cause re: dismissal | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Order to show cause re: dismissal scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 01:30:00 pm in c03 at central justice center. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | The order to show cause re: dismissal is scheduled for 02/24/2021 at 01:30 pm in department c3. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Minutes finalized for status conference 01/06/2021 01:30:00 pm. | |
January 06, 2021 | Action | Clerk's certificate of service by mail oc generated | |
November 04, 2020 | Action | Status conference scheduled for 01/06/2021 at 01:30:00 pm in c03 at central justice center. | |
November 04, 2020 | Action | Status conference continued to 01/06/2021 at 01:30 pm in this department pursuant to party's motion. | |
November 04, 2020 | Action | Minutes finalized for status conference 11/04/2020 01:30:00 pm. | |
August 05, 2020 | Action | Status conference scheduled for 11/04/2020 at 01:30:00 pm in c03 at central justice center. | |
August 05, 2020 | Action | Status conference continued to 11/04/2020 at 01:30 pm in this department pursuant to party's motion. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.