Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Abigail Del Gado, Maritza Elide Ozuna, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Abigail Del Gado, Maritza Elide Ozuna, Brixal Capital, Evelia Barajas, Fernando Velasco, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Sheila B. Fell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSheila B. Fell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2019 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
COMPLAINT FILED BY OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE; DEL GADO, ABIGAIL ON 07/08/2019
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE; DEL GADO, ABIGAIL ON 07/08/2019
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE; DEL GADO, ABIGAIL ON 07/08/2019
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BARAJAS, EVELIA ON 08/16/2019
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 07/12/2019
Date: 2019-07-12T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 07/08/2019.
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 07/17/2019
Date: 2019-07-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/08/2019 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE - PETITION FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 08/15/2019
Date: 2019-08-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 07/29/2019
Date: 2019-07-29T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (GRANTED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 08/20/2019
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 08/16/2019.
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-08-24T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY BARAJAS, EVELIA ON 08/16/2019
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/08/2019 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 10/03/2019
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 09/17/2019
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/29/2019
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/29/2019
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/30/2019
Date: 2019-10-30T00:00:00ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/29/2019
Date: 2019-10-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 11/26/2019 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 12/30/2019
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 12/30/2019
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 01/15/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1682104 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 12/30/2019
Date: 2019-12-30T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 01/14/2020
Date: 2020-01-14T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 02/18/2020
Date: 2020-02-18T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 02/27/2020
Date: 2020-02-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/20/2020 08:45:00 AM.
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2897201 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-03-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/14/2020
Date: 2020-03-14T00:00:00MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 03/16/2020
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BARAJAS, EVELIA ON 02/26/2020
Date: 2020-02-26T00:00:00JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/09/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-06-03T00:00:00APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS RECEIVED ON 07/13/2020.
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 07/14/2020
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 08/12/2020 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-08-13T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 09/14/2020
Date: 2020-09-14T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1731311 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 08/06/2020
Date: 2020-08-06T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/05/2020
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/05/2020
Date: 2020-10-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/28/2020
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/28/2020
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/28/2020
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (SPECIAL INT.) FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/28/2020
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 01/06/2021
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/12/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1781850 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/09/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-11-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1781851 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 01/06/2021 AT 10:00:00 AM IN VCC4 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-11-24T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2953346 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3950102 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41128000 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 01/06/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 01/21/2021
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2953345 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-07T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 01/21/2021
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 01/27/2021
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO FRED SLAUGHTER EFFECTIVE 03/01/2021.
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3974431 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-02-11T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41153094 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 02/22/2021
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 02/22/2021
Date: 2021-02-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/02/2021
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 03/02/2021
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 03/17/2021
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/17/2021
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 03/18/2021
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/18/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/17/2021
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/02/2021
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 04/07/2021
Date: 2021-04-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS 04/07/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 04/19/2021
Date: 2021-04-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 04/28/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT 04/28/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 04/20/2021
Date: 2021-04-20T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (THIRD) FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 05/26/2021
Date: 2021-05-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31021892 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-06-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 05/03/2021 10:26:00 AM.
Date: 2021-05-03T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 06/14/2021
Date: 2021-06-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELOCATION
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 07/21/2021
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/15/2021
Date: 2021-10-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2021
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 08/04/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 08/17/2021
Date: 2021-08-17T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 07/26/2021
Date: 2021-07-26T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/05/2021
Date: 2021-10-05T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 11/17/2021
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/14/2021
Date: 2021-10-14T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/18/2021
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA; BRIXAL CAPITAL ON 10/22/2021
Date: 2021-10-22T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/19/2021
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31084997 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER (REJECTED) FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 10/19/2021
Date: 2021-10-19T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 11/15/2021
Date: 2021-11-15T00:00:00MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 11/17/2021
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 11/17/2021
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 01/19/2022
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY DEL GADO, ABIGAIL; OZUNA, MARITZA ELIDE ON 01/05/2022
Date: 2022-01-05T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 01/10/2022
Date: 2022-01-10T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 02/08/2022
Date: 2022-02-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 02/23/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-02-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES 01/19/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-21T00:00:00JUDGMENT SUBMITTED BY JAVANI, SABRINA; BRIXAL CAPITAL REJECTED ON 04/07/2022.
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (NOT SIGNED) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 11/17/2021
Date: 2021-11-17T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/22/2022.
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 03/22/2022
Date: 2022-03-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 08/16/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED ON 05/23/2022
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41337214 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-05-23T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO DONALD GAFFNEY EFFECTIVE 04/22/2022.
Date: 2022-04-11T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/13/2022 02:41:00 PM.
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 05/20/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/12/2022.
Date: 2022-04-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-04-07T00:00:00JUDGMENT (OF DISMISSAL) FILED BY JAVANI, SABRINA; BRIXAL CAPITAL; BRIXAL CAPITAL ON 05/10/2022
Date: 2022-05-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY BRIXAL CAPITAL; JAVANI, SABRINA ON 05/20/2022
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 05/20/2022 08:58:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-20T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-05-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: January 23, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2023E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31276420 REJECTED.
Date: March 02, 2023MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 12/01/2022 04:44:00 PM.
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 02/10/2023 09:30:00 AM.
Date: February 10, 2023CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-12-01T00:00:00CASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID HESSELTINE EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.
Date: December 20, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.