Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Balboa Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Abbe Enterprise 1, Llc, Bobby E. Bagby, in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Corey Scott Cramin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorey Scott Cramin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2018 |
CategoryOther Collections |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 10/18/2018
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 10/18/2018
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 10/18/2018
Date: 2018-10-18T00:00:00NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS - PARTICIPANT FILED BY BAGBY, BOBBY E. ON 12/05/2018
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/24/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2019-05-01T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 06/06/2019
Date: 2019-06-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 12/05/2018
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 12/05/2018
Date: 2018-12-05T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 07/13/2020
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/BANKRUPTCY 07/10/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/23/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 10/22/2020
Date: 2020-10-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/24/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-06-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL/BANKRUPTCY 10/23/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-21T00:00:00REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 12/22/2020
Date: 2020-12-22T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/08/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 01/03/2020
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 09/13/2019
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3975596 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 01/08/2020
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 03/29/2021
Date: March 29, 2021REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 03/10/2021
Date: March 10, 2021JUDGMENT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 03/12/2021
Date: March 12, 2021E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2988099 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (WORKSHEET) FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 03/10/2021
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/10/2021.
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2021REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 03/10/2021
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (SUMMARY OF CASE) FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 03/10/2021
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2981378 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-02-19T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY BALBOA CAPITAL CORPORATION ON 03/10/2021
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.