Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jean C. Johns, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Adroit Worldwide Media, Inc., Cloverleaf Media, Llc, Douglas Manchester, Kevin B. Howard, Kurtis Van Horn, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Glenda Sanders presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlenda Sanders Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2017 |
CategoryBusiness Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
OPPOSITION FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 11/21/2019
Date: 2019-11-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/10/2019 09:36:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/16/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-23T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-05-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3818410 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-07-31T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/30/2019
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/30/2019
Date: 2019-09-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/06/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-08-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/12/2019 03:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 10/17/2019
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 10/17/2019
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 12/03/2019
Date: 2019-12-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/01/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-11-08T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2859018 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1693124 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-12-02T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 10/17/2019
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT SUBMITTED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. REJECTED ON 12/04/2019.
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 02/06/2020
Date: 2020-02-06T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/04/2019 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/12/2019
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 01/21/2020
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 01/08/2020
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/16/2020
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 01/21/2020
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 01/29/2020
Date: 2020-01-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT 2020-01-24 13:30:00.0.
Date: 2020-01-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41065360 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 03/16/2020
Date: 2020-03-16T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 02/11/2020
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 08/07/2020
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1731565 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-20T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 04/06/2020
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-15T00:00:00MOTION FOR PREFERENCE (TRIAL) FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 08/07/2020
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/14/2020 09:25:00 AM.
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 07/10/2020
Date: 2020-07-10T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 07/15/2020
Date: 2020-07-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 07/17/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-19T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/28/2020
Date: 2020-08-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-07-14T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B. ON 09/25/2020
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 10/23/2020
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/20/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-03T00:00:00NOTICE OF HEARING (STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 01/26/2021
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/10/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 02/03/2021
Date: 2021-02-03T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 03/02/2021
Date: 2021-03-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/15/2021 11:04:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 09/25/2020
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B. ON 09/25/2020
Date: 2020-09-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/06/2021 03:14:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 10/23/2020
Date: 2020-10-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/11/2020 03:36:00 PM.
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-13T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 12/29/2020
Date: 2020-12-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/21/2021 04:10:00 PM.
Date: 2021-07-21T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 03/01/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 06/11/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-06-21T00:00:00ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 06/08/2021
Date: 2021-06-08T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 06/09/2021
Date: 2021-06-09T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 09/03/2021
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00STIPULATION TO CONTINUE - TRIAL FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 09/03/2021
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00STATEMENT OF COMPLIANCE FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/24/2021 01:59:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE 09/13/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-22T00:00:00STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B.; VAN HORN, KURTIS JR ON 11/09/2021
Date: 2021-11-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/01/2021 11:35:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CONTROVERTED ISSUES FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/16/2021
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/17/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-09-17T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT (VOIR DIRE QUESTIONS) FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/20/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 10/27/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-09-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1) FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/14/2021
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00STATEMENT OF CASE FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2021
Date: 2021-09-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/10/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00OPPOSITION (TO MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3) FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/14/2021
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/14/2021
Date: 2021-09-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 11/23/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-11-24T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00JOINT STATEMENT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 01/03/2022
Date: 2022-01-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/04/2022 09:47:00 AM.
Date: 2022-01-04T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/28/2022
Date: January 28, 2022CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2022NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 11/10/2021
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SANDERS, GLENDA ON 08/17/2017.
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 08/17/2017
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00PER MINUTE ORDER CASE 30-2016-00861757 FEES ARE WAIVED FOR PLAINTIFF
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C.; JOHNS, JEAN C.; JOHNS, JEAN C.; JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 09/13/2017
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 08/17/2017
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 10/25/2017 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-10-25T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (DECLARATION OF STEVEN HANLE) FILED BY HOWARD, KEVIN B. ON 10/10/2017
Date: 2017-10-10T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 08/17/2017
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JOHNS, JEAN C. ON 08/17/2017
Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/07/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-02-13T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2017-09-05 13:34:00.0.
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41022478 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/18/2019 02:18:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-09-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/27/2019 09:42:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/13/2019 03:37:00 PM.
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/23/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-01-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3861242 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-27T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.