Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Joshua Gushulak, Login Gushulak, Monique Violette, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Chapman Townhomes, Inc., Chapman Villas Townhomes Homeowners As, Ingeborg Emmy Kane, Ingeborg Emmy Kane, As Trustee Of The, Michael Fritz Beier, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with David A. Hoffer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Hoffer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 22, 2017 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 04/10/2018
Date: 2018-04-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF TRANSCRIPT FILED
Date: 2018-04-09T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G055954
Date: 2018-04-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/20/2018
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 04/20/2018
Date: 2018-04-20T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4837771 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/23/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 04/26/2018
Date: 2018-04-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1442111 REJECTED.
Date: 2018-04-24T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 11/26/2018 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2018-11-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 01/28/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-01-31T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 03/06/2019
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 05/06/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 05/08/2019
Date: 2019-05-08T00:00:00OPINION G055954
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/13/2019 10:30:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 09/12/2019
Date: 2019-09-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/12/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/16/2019 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00REMITTITUR (G055954) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 09/18/2019
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/19/2019 11:20:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/16/2019
Date: 2019-08-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 09/23/2019 10:24:00 AM.
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/19/2019 01:59:00 PM.
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 10/08/2019
Date: 2019-10-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 10/23/2019
Date: 2019-10-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3847207 REJECTED.
Date: 2019-11-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 10/22/2019 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE (PORTIONS OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 11/26/2019
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 11/26/2019
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 11/26/2019
Date: 2019-11-26T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/17/2020
Date: 2020-01-17T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 01/08/2020
Date: 2020-01-08T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/28/2020
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 01/23/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-01-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/05/2020 10:26:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT 02/05/2020 10:18:00 AM.
Date: 2020-02-05T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 02/03/2020
Date: 2020-02-03T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/04/2020
Date: 2020-03-04T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 02/11/2020
Date: 2020-02-11T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 02/07/2020
Date: 2020-02-07T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 03/13/2020
Date: 2020-03-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 03/11/2020
Date: 2020-03-11T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/16/2020
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: 2020-04-07T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/19/2020 12:15:00 PM.
Date: 2020-03-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE
Date: 2020-05-14T00:00:00DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/01/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES 06/24/2020 10:32:00 AM.
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/01/2020
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1727338 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3895606 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-06T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41073581 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2898843 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41073592 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3895702 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2898924 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1727465 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41073731 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3895751 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41073681 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3895616 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-07-28T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/17/2020
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/24/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-08-24T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/11/2020
Date: 2020-08-11T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/17/2020
Date: 2020-08-17T00:00:00ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/26/2020
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2908858 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41083576 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/25/2020
Date: 2020-08-25T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 11/09/2020
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 09/02/2020
Date: 2020-09-02T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/09/2020.
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 11/12/2020 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 11/12/2020
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 11/13/2020 10:47:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 11/18/2020
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2963784 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-12-07T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/18/2020 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/04/2021.
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/04/2021
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3967399 REJECTED.
Date: 2020-12-31T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 01/04/2021
Date: 2021-01-04T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL PHYSICAL OR MENTAL EXAMINATION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 01/12/2021
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/12/2021.
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/06/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00ORDER GRANTING (EX PARTE APPLICATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/06/2021
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 01/19/2021
Date: 2021-01-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/26/2021
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/27/2021
Date: 2021-01-27T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/26/2021
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00COMPLAINT FILED BY VIOLETTE, MONIQUE; GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN ON 03/22/2017
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY VIOLETTE, MONIQUE; GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN ON 03/22/2017
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY VIOLETTE, MONIQUE; GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN ON 03/22/2017
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 03/22/2017.
Date: 2017-03-22T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 04/14/2017
Date: 2017-04-14T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/11/2017 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2017-04-18T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/13/2017
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1394790 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/13/2017
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1393992 REJECTED.
Date: 2017-06-23T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/13/2017
Date: 2017-07-13T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/07/2017
Date: 2017-08-07T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/14/2017
Date: 2017-08-14T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT 08/14/2017 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2017-08-15T00:00:00NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 09/13/2017
Date: 2017-09-13T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/28/2017
Date: 2017-08-28T00:00:00CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/25/2017
Date: 2017-08-25T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/11/2017 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2017-09-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 11/03/2017
Date: 2017-11-03T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 11/17/2017
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/29/2017
Date: 2017-11-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/13/2017 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-21T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 11/28/2017 02:30:00 PM.
Date: 2017-11-28T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 11/30/2017
Date: 2017-11-30T00:00:00PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017.
Date: 2017-11-14T00:00:00AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 12/07/2017
Date: 2017-12-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 12/13/2017
Date: 2017-12-13T00:00:00JUDGMENT (JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/12/2017
Date: 2017-12-12T00:00:00MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 12/28/2017
Date: 2017-12-28T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/17/2018
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 01/18/2018 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/17/2018
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/17/2018
Date: 2018-01-17T00:00:00ORDER - OTHER FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 01/18/2018
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 01/18/2018
Date: 2018-01-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/26/2018 08:54:00 AM.
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-01-26T00:00:00NOTICE OF APPEAL - UNLIMITED CIVIL FILED
Date: 2018-02-05T00:00:00RECEIPT FOR RECORDS AND PAPERS G055954
Date: 2018-02-08T00:00:00NOTIFICATION OF FILING NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: 2018-02-07T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT
Date: 2018-02-16T00:00:00NOTICE TO REPORTER TO PREPARE TRANSCRIPT ON APPEAL
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF CLERK'S TRANSCRIPT FEES
Date: 2018-03-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 04/02/2018
Date: 2018-04-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 03/26/2018 02:00:00 PM.
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2018-03-28T00:00:00MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 01/29/2021
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/29/2021.
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) RECEIVED ON 01/26/2021.
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 02/01/2021
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 02/08/2021
Date: 2021-02-08T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 02/16/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 03/01/2021
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/04/2021
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 03/04/2021
Date: 2021-03-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 03/09/2021
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE CROSS COMPLAINT 03/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-03-09T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 03/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-03-10T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 03/08/2021
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 03/08/2021
Date: 2021-03-08T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00MOTION TO DEEM ANSWERS ADMITTED FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 06/01/2021
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/01/2021
Date: 2021-06-01T00:00:00MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT FILED BY VIOLETTE, MONIQUE; GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN ON 06/11/2021
Date: 2021-06-11T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE 06/18/2021 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2021-06-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/30/2021
Date: 2021-06-30T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/12/2021 10:49:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR 07/12/2021 11:21:00 AM.
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT - OTHER FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 07/16/2021
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/20/2021
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00MOTION FOR SANCTIONS FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 07/20/2021
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/05/2021
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 07/20/2021
Date: 2021-07-20T00:00:00MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT/ADJUDICATION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/05/2021
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/05/2021
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF INTENT TO INTRODUCE DOCUMENTARY EVIDENCE FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/05/2021
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/05/2021.
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/10/2021 04:25:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/05/2021
Date: 2021-08-05T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/11/2021 01:45:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION (MOTION SUMMARY JUDGEMENT) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/12/2021
Date: 2021-08-12T00:00:00REPLY - OTHER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/23/2021
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/20/2021
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/31/2021
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 08/30/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-08-30T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1806890 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2978401 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41153063 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1865376 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2978402 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2978404 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3975185 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00MOTION TO STRIKE FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 05/26/2020
Date: 2020-05-26T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 06/23/2020
Date: 2020-06-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31022021 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41153065 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21023432 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41199970 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-08-31T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 10/18/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41153066 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41218987 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1806892 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3975188 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/18/2021
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2978405 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-10-18T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/05/2021
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 10/21/2021
Date: 2021-10-21T00:00:00PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/19/2022
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY KANE, SANDRA INGRID ON 01/25/2022
Date: 2022-01-25T00:00:00STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY KANE, INGEBORG EMMY ON 01/19/2022
Date: 2022-01-19T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/14/2022
Date: 2022-04-14T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/15/2022
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 04/15/2022
Date: 2022-04-15T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/18/2022 09:39:00 AM.
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/18/2022 03:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00OBJECTION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 04/18/2022
Date: 2022-04-18T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/22/2022 01:45:00 PM.
Date: 2022-04-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21147426 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-04-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/02/2022 09:15:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-02T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/27/2022 11:44:00 AM.
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR TERMINATION OF SANCTIONS 07/11/2022 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 06/27/2022
Date: 2022-06-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/26/2022
Date: 2022-07-26T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 2) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY INGEBORG EMMY KANE, AS TRUSTEE OF THE INGEBORG E. KANE FAMILY TRUST ON 08/01/2022
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/02/2022
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/02/2022
Date: 2022-08-02T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/29/2022
Date: 2022-07-29T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/01/2022
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00MOTION FOR JOINDER FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/01/2022
Date: 2022-08-01T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31144645 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 4) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 3) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 2) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 5) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 1) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/08/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/03/2022
Date: 2022-08-03T00:00:00NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/08/2022
Date: 2022-08-08T00:00:00REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/15/2022
Date: 2022-08-15T00:00:00WITNESS LIST FILED BY INGEBORG EMMY KANE, AS TRUSTEE OF THE INGEBORG E. KANE FAMILY TRUST ON 08/16/2022
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/16/2021 11:45:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-16T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 04/22/2021 09:30:00 AM.
Date: 2021-04-23T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 05/10/2021 01:30:00 PM.
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3975186 REJECTED.
Date: 2021-05-14T00:00:00NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 05/18/2021
Date: 2021-05-18T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/19/2021.
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 05/19/2021
Date: 2021-05-19T00:00:00MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 05/27/2021
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 05/27/2021
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/27/2021
Date: 2021-05-27T00:00:00EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY INGEBORG EMMY KANE, AS TRUSTEE OF THE INGEBORG E. KANE FAMILY TRUST ON 08/16/2022
Date: 2022-08-16T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/17/2022
Date: 2022-08-17T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/22/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY KANE, SANDRA INGRID ON 08/19/2022
Date: 2022-08-19T00:00:00SUPPLEMENTAL FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/23/2022
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/22/2022
Date: 2022-08-22T00:00:00JURY INSTRUCTIONS FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/23/2022
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41363574 REJECTED.
Date: August 29, 2022E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21188060 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/23/2022
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31189296 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/25/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00OPPOSITION FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 08/23/2022
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11017419 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31185603 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41363576 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/23/2022 10:00:00 AM.
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21191725 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31185602 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31185601 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11017418 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11017416 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31197259 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41367321 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11027015 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL JUDGE DAVID A. HOFFER'S PARTICIPATION IN SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE FILED BY GUSHULAK, JOSHUA; GUSHULAK, LOGIN; VIOLETTE, MONIQUE ON 08/23/2022
Date: 2022-08-23T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11017417 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-26T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41436041 REJECTED.
Date: January 18, 2023E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21188061 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41367320 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 11021126 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 41363575 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR JURY TRIAL 08/24/2022 09:30:00 AM.
Date: August 30, 2022MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 12/15/2022 09:00:00 AM.
Date: December 15, 2022E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21191726 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21188062 REJECTED.
Date: 2022-08-29T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 1) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 3) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 4) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 7) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 5) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 10) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 8) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 9) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 6) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 13) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/25/2022.
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 12) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00MOTION IN LIMINE (NO. 11) FILED BY CHAPMAN TOWNHOMES, INC. ON 07/25/2022
Date: 2022-07-25T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.