Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
R.J. Noble Co., filed a(n) Civil case against Ebs General Engineering, Inc., Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Orange County Transportation Authority, C.C. Myers, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2016 | Action | E-filing transaction 3474139 received on 10/31/2016 09:15:36 am. | |
November 02, 2016 | Action | Request for dismissal (with prejudice complaint) submitted by r.j. noble co. rejected on 11/02/2016. | |
July 08, 2016 | Action | E-filing transaction number 2476253 rejected. | |
July 07, 2016 | Action | E-filing transaction number 3431359 rejected. | |
May 12, 2016 | Action | Case consolidated on 05/12/2016. 30-2015-00803667-cu-bc-cjc is designated the lead case. | |
May 02, 2016 | Action | E-filing transaction 3409215 received on 05/02/2016 03:27:09 pm. | |
May 02, 2016 | Action | Notice of ruling filed by safeco insurance company of america on 05/02/2016 | |
April 11, 2016 | Action | E-filing transaction 4528895 received on 04/05/2016 04:17:15 pm. | |
April 08, 2016 | Action | E-filing transaction 3399926 received on 04/05/2016 05:25:53 pm. | |
April 08, 2016 | Action | Payment received by rapidlegal for 36 - motion or other (not 1st) paper requiring a hearing in the amount of 60.00, transaction number 11948655 and receipt number 11772808. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.