Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Orange County. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts with Martha K. Gooding presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartha K. Gooding Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 22, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions563 days |
Filing LocationOrange County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2726 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/27/2010 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W10 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.
Date: 2010-10-14T00:00:00CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 05/22/2009
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (CCP 1033) FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 12/06/2010
Date: December 06, 2010COMPLAINT FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 05/22/2009
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS AND/OR TELEPHONE FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 11/03/2010
Date: 2010-11-03T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 06/02/2009
Date: 2009-06-02T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 05/22/2009
Date: 2009-05-22T00:00:00E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4630021 REJECTED.
Date: November 03, 2016REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 12/06/2010
Date: December 06, 2010REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 12/06/2010
Date: 2010-12-06T00:00:00DECLARATION - OTHER (INTEREST CALCULATION) FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 12/06/2010
Date: 2010-12-06T00:00:00ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 11/07/2016
Date: November 07, 2016JUDGMENT (CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY CITIFINANCIAL INC. ON 12/06/2010
Date: 2010-12-06T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.