Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
City Of St Louis, filed a(n) Cc Other Tort case represented by Duncan , Abby Joe, against Williams , Arthur, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with HOGAN, ELIZABETH BYRNE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOGAN, ELIZABETH BYRNE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryCc Other Tort |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Notice of Dismissal
Date: July 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial Scheduled | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Issued | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Requested | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Non-Est | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.