Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
First National Bank Of Omaha, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by York , Brandon Michael, against Doskocil , Louis J, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with HAYS, HEATHER JACQUELIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAYS, HEATHER JACQUELIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryAc Contract-Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeNot Disposed |
Notice of Dismissal
Date: September 28, 2023Hearing Scheduled
Date: August 28, 2023Notice of Service
Date: August 16, 2023Notice of Dismissal
Date: September 27, 2023Summons Returned Non-Est
Date: August 15, 2023Alias Summons Issued
Date: July 31, 2023Alias Summons Requested
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Non-Est | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Issued | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled | |
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.