Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank N.A., filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Irby , Bobby Glynn, against Floods , Rosie, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with ROITHER, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROITHER, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Judmt/Dec Dis Filed | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.