Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
1904 Group Management Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Reinker , Randall J, against George , Christa, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with HAYS, HEATHER JACQUELIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAYS, HEATHER JACQUELIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryAc Landlord Actions (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Return Service-Writ Served | |
March 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail-Undeliverable | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Eviction | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Requested | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
February 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Posted | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Associate Ct |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.