Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Metropolitain St Louis Sewer Distict, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Leonard , Pamela Beals, against Holman-Rome , Kimberly, Rome , Rex A, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with HAYS, HEATHER JACQUELIN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHAYS, HEATHER JACQUELIN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryAc Contract/Account (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Correspondence Sent
Date: July 11, 2023Judgment Entered
Date: July 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Sent | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Sub of Counsel | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Filed | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.