Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lou Budkes Arrow Finance Co A Corp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Whealen , William Francis Jr, against Leonard , Eric, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with ROITHER, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeROITHER, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Notice of Service
Date: July 17, 2023Release Filed
Date: July 31, 2023Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Release Filed | |
July 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Garn Release/Return/Recall | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Return Service - Other | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Garnishment Paid to Attorney | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Execution/Garnishment Issued | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Execution/Garnish | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Req for Transcript Judgment | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.