Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Firstbank, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Mosier , Scott Donald, against Doe , John, Holt , Dakota James, in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJARRELL, BRADLEY D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryAc Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2023 | Hearing | Default Judgment | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
January 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain | |
January 11, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain Document ID: 23-SOUD-4, for DOE, JOHN. |
|
January 11, 2023 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Scheduled For: 02/07/2023; 9:00 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
|
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain Document ID: 23-SOUD-3, for HOLT, DAKOTA JAMES. |
|
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.