Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Myers , Edward J., against Kersey , Julie Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJARRELL, BRADLEY D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
August 14, 2023 | Hearing | Dismissed by Parties | |
July 17, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
July 17, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
May 11, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
May 11, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
March 06, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
March 06, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
February 02, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
February 02, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.