Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Nilsen , Barbara, against Wright , Melvin D, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with Nicole Sydney Zellweger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNicole Sydney Zellweger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
June 29, 2023 | Hearing | Dismissed by Parties | |
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Non-Est | |
June 06, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Pluries Summons Issued | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Requested | |
May 25, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Returned Non-Est | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.