Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bruffett , John William filed a(n) Pr Supervised Without Will case in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with Raymond M. Gross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRaymond M. Gross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2022 |
CategoryPr Supervised Without Will |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeNot Disposed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notc-Time to File Annl Set/Rpt | |
August 16, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Affd-Publctn Notc Ltrs Granted | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 26, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
July 26, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
July 26, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.