Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Calloway , Raymon D, filed a(n) Cc Declaratory Judgment case against Mo Dept Of Revenue, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with GROSS, RAYMOND MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROSS, RAYMOND MICHAEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 22, 2022 |
CategoryCc Declaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeUncontested |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Uncontested | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer Filed | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Judmt/Dec Dis Filed | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Filing: | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Review Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.