Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tole , Dolores, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case represented by Garrett , Jacob Yadon, against Ross , Jason, Ross , Sherry, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with R. Craig Carter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeR. Craig Carter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2022 |
CategoryCc Other Real Estate Actions |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeNot Disposed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Bench Trial Scheduled | |
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 14, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
August 14, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Filed | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Filed | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Filed | |
August 04, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.