Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Worthey , Diana Marlene, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Worthey , Steve Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with CARTER, R CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARTER, R CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2013 |
CategoryCc Dissolution- W/O Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the docket entry dated 11-5-14 Judge/Clerk - Note was emailed to atty. Bates-Crouch. |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Dismissed without prejudice. |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Associated Entries: 10/15/2014 - Dismissal Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 11/05/2014; 9:00 AM ; R CRAIG CARTER; Ozark |
|
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the docket entry dated 10-15-14 Order was emailed to atty. Bates-Crouch. |
|
October 15, 2014 | Hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 11/05/2014 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice \n Scheduled For: 11/05/2014; 9:00 AM ; R CRAIG CARTER; Ozark |
|
October 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Cause having exceeded time standards for case processing the Court does hereby Order this cause placed on the Dismissal Docket on November 5, 2014 at 9:00 AM. Cause may only be removed for good cause shown by parties. Clerk to notify interested parties. RCC Filed By: R CRAIG CARTER |
|
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 13-SMCC-338; Served To - WORTHEY, STEVE LYNN; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 20-SEP-13; Served Time - 08:15:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Circuit Document ID: 13-SMCC-338, for WORTHEY, STEVE LYNN. |
|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Petition Filed - Domestic Rel | |
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Dissolution |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.