Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bales , Christopher Allen, filed a(n) case against Bales , Lynsey D, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with CARTER, R CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARTER, R CRAIG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request Filed REQUEST FOR INFORMATION FROM COURT RECORD. |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note No copies to send in this case as there has been no action in this case since 7-7-15. |
|
July 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit of Credit for Child Support |
|
December 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit of Credit for Child Support and/or Maintenance Owed to Custodial Parent filed. Filed By: LYNSEY D (JOHNSON) BALES |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Affidavit of Credit for Child Support and/or Maintenance Owed to Custodial Parent filed. Filed By: LYNSEY D (JOHNSON) BALES |
|
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Certified copy of the Judgment, Order and Decree of Dissolution of Marriage was forward to atty. Engelbrecht and respondent. |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Dissolution Judgment, Order and Decree of Dissolution of Marriage signed by Judge Craig Carter filed. Marriage dissolved. Marital Separation Agreement and Parenting Plan approved. Pet. is ordered to pay child support to be paid to the Family Support Payment Center as trustee. Costs to Pet. |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Associated Entries: 12/10/2013 - Disposition Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/23/2013; 9:00 AM ; R CRAIG CARTER; Ozark |
|
December 23, 2013 | Docket Event |
Form 14 Filed Filed By: DALE ROBERT ENGELBRECHT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.