Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blache' , Allison W filed a(n) case against Blache , Robert Dean, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Certified copy of the Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage was forward to both parties. |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Judgment of Dissolution entered. /s/ JJacobs |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Associated Entries: 07/30/2013 - Disposition Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/28/2013; 10:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Dissolution Judgment of Dissolution of Marriage signed by Judge John Jacobs filed. Marriage dissolved. Court costs are to be paid from the court cost deposit previously posted. |
|
July 30, 2013 | Hearing |
Disposition Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 08/28/2013 - Uncontested \n Scheduled For: 08/28/2013; 10:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Case set for disposition on August 28, 2013, at 10:00 a.m. /s/ JJacobs |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the Judge's docket sheet was forward to both parties. |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed Respondent's Answer to Petitioner's Petition for Dissolution of Marriage with attachments filed. |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filing: Property and Debt Statement and Proposed Separation Agreement filed. |
|
July 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Income & Expense Stmnt Filed Filed By: ALLISON W BLACHE' |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.