Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pankowski , Wally Joseph, against Stoewer , Karol K, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with VEENSTRA, LYNETTE B presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVEENSTRA, LYNETTE B Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2013 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing: JUDGES DOCKET |
|
December 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Filed By: WALLY JOSEPH PANKOWSKI \n Associated Entries: 12/04/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 12/04/2013 - Court Trial Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/03/2014; 9:30 AM ; LYNETTE B VEENSTRA; Ozark |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order On the court's own motion, cause is reset for trial 1/3/14 at 9:30 a.m. Clerk to notify parties. Lynette Veenstra, Judge |
|
December 04, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 12/06/2013; 9:30 AM Court Trial |
|
December 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 12/09/2013 - Dismissed by Parties \n Scheduled For: 01/03/2014; 9:30 AM ; LYNETTE B VEENSTRA; Ozark |
|
November 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice TO DFT |
|
November 01, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled PLAINTIFF APPEARS BY ATTY JUSTIN NELSON AND REQUESTS A CONTINUANCE. DEF DOES NOT APPEAR. CAUSE SET FOR TRIAL OR DISPOSITION ON 12/6/13 AT 9:30AM. CLERK TO NOTIFY DEFENDANT Filed By: LYNETTE B VEENSTRA \n Hearing Continued From: 11/01/2013; 9:30 AM Court Trial |
|
November 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 12/04/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/06/2013; 9:30 AM ; LYNETTE B VEENSTRA; Ozark |
|
September 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Filed By: WALLY JOSEPH PANKOWSKI |
|
September 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Held PLAINTIFF APPEARS BY ATTY MARSHA STILES AND ATTY LUCAS SMITH. DEF APPEARS PRO SE. CAUSE IS SET FOR TRIAL OR DISPOSITION 11/1/13 AT 9:30AM. Filed By: LYNETTE B VEENSTRA \n Scheduled For: 09/13/2013; 9:30 AM ; LYNETTE B VEENSTRA; Ozark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.