Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Pech , Christopher Edward, against Crisp , Robert Deard, represented by Holthouse , Travis William, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2013 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note ENTRY TO PARTIES |
|
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice DISMISSED FOR LACK OF STANDING Filed By: JOHN B JACOBS JR \n Associated Entries: 05/22/2013 - Civil Setting Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 06/26/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
June 25, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filing: LIMITED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE BY RAY GROSS |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed By: TRAVIS WILLIAM HOLTHOUSE |
|
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Filed By: CHRISTOPHER EDWARD PECH |
|
June 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Filing: BILL OF SALE |
|
May 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 06/26/2013 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice DISMISSED FOR LACK OF STANDING \n Scheduled For: 06/26/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
May 22, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Held PLT AND DFT APPEAR Scheduled For: 05/22/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
April 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 13-ADSM-142; Served To - CRISP, ROBERT DEARD; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 23-APR-13; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
April 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice TO COUNSEL WITH COURT DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.