Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bank Of America N A, Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) case represented by Armstrong , Jeanine R, against Buswell , Helen Thomasina, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Judgment Entered
Date: April 24, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JEANINE R ARMSTRONG \n On Behalf Of: BANK OF AMERICA N A |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Interrogatories Filed | |
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 15-GARN-291; Served To - CENTURY BANK-THEODOSIA; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 01-OCT-15; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Return on Garnishment/Execution Number 13-GARN-301 |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Requested Filed By: JOHN BROCK ROWATT |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 15-GARN-291 for HELEN THOMASINA BUSWELL; returnable date: 20-NOV-2015; Garnishee: CENTURY BANK-THEODOSIA |
|
September 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Interrogatories Filed | |
October 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE OF THE PLAINTIFF. Filed By: JOHN BROCK ROWATT |
|
August 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Interrogatories Filed | |
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 13-GARN-301; Served To - FIRST HOME SAVINGS BANK-GAINESVILLE; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 13-JUN-13; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.