Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Mcneile , James Michael, against Russell , Theodore D, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2013 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
November 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Interrogatories Filed | |
October 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 13-GARN-486; Served To - COMMERCE BANK; Server - SO ST LOUIS COUNTY-CLAYTON; Served Date - 17-OCT-13; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Garnishment Requested | |
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 13-GARN-486 for THEODORE D RUSSELL; returnable date: 12-NOV-2013; Garnishee: COMMERCE BANK |
|
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Interrogatories Filed | |
August 22, 2013 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 13-GARN-409; Served To - BANK OF AMERICA; Server - SO GREENE COUNTY-SPRINGFIELD; Served Date - 19-AUG-13; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 13-GARN-409 for THEODORE D RUSSELL; returnable date: 13-SEP-2013; Garnishee: BANK OF AMERICA |
|
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Requested Filed By: JAMES MICHAEL MCNEILE |
|
July 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT TO CIRCUIT CLERK AND COPY TO PARTIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.