Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chappue , Martin Joseph filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CERTIFICATE OF CLERK REMAILED PER REQUEST |
|
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Probate Ord Close File Misc | |
May 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Clerk CERTIFICATE ISSUED. CERTIFIED COPY TO APPLICANT |
|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event | Affd-Publctn of Notice to Cred | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Notc to Creditor-Small Estate | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note BOND WAIVED. PUBLICATION IS REQUIRED BY SEC. 473.097.5 RSMO. Filed By: JOHN B JACOBS JR |
|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note NOTICE FORWARDED TO OZARK COUNTY TIMES. CERTIFICATE OF CLERK WILL BE ISSUED UPON FILING OF AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION. APPLICANT IS TO CONTACT OZARK COUNTY TIMES AT 417 679 4641 FOR PUBLICATION COSTS. |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Change of Venue Received RECEIVED FILE ON CHANGE OF VENUE FROM JEFFERSON COUNTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.