Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lakes, Llc, filed a(n) case against Doe , John, Nash , Lisa, Nash , Dennis, Nash , Mary, Hartman , Florence J, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with MOODY, JOHN G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOODY, JOHN G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment signed by Judge John Moody filed. It is ordered that Pet. Lakes, LLC is the fee simple absolute owner of the described real estate. It is further found that Resps. have no right, title or interest in or to said property. GAL fee of $150 awarded to Linda McKinney. Costs taxed to Pet. |
|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 05/30/2012 - Motion Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 06/06/2012; 9:00 AM ; JOHN G MOODY; Ozark |
|
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Certified copy of the Judgment was forward to atty. Hall. |
|
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed Motion for Default Judgment filed. Filed By: SCOTT LWAYNE HALL |
|
May 30, 2012 | Hearing |
Notice of Hearing Filed Filed By: SCOTT LWAYNE HALL |
|
May 30, 2012 | Hearing |
Motion Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 06/06/2012 - Default Judgment \n Scheduled For: 06/06/2012; 9:00 AM ; JOHN G MOODY; Ozark |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Publication Proof of Publication filed. |
|
April 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing: Acceptance of Appointment to Serve as Guardian Ad Litem filed. Filed By: LINDA THERESA MCKINNEY |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem was forward to attys. Hall and McKinney. |
|
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing GAL Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem signed by Judge John Moody filed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.