Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Gamache , David Reid, against Belt , Kari Terese, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 13, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties COPY TO PARTIES Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE \n Associated Entries: 05/11/2012 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 05/11/2012 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 05/30/2012; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice PARTIES NOTIFED OF CONTINUANCE DATE |
|
May 11, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 05/29/2012 - Dismissed by Parties COPY TO PARTIES \n Scheduled For: 05/30/2012; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
May 11, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 05/16/2012; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE |
|
April 25, 2012 | Docket Event |
Family Member/Roommate Served Document ID - 12-ADSM-149; Served To - BELT, KARI TERESE; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 20-APR-12; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Pet Filed in Associate Ct Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE |
|
April 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 05/11/2012 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 05/16/2012; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice TO COUNSEL WITH COURT DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.