Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shoener , Jonathan L, against Cain , Lisa L, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 26, 2009 |
CategoryAc Contract-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n Associated Entries: 12/14/2009 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 12/14/2009 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 03/10/2010; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER |
|
December 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 12/16/2009; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note DOCKET FAXED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD |
|
December 14, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 03/01/2010 - Dismissed by Parties \n Scheduled For: 03/10/2010; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice Copy of non est summons to counsel. Counsel to advise court how to proceed. |
|
November 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Non-Est Document ID - 09-ADSM-637; Served To - CAIN, LISA L; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 24-NOV-09; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Non-est; Service Text - moved to Mtn. Home, Ar |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 09-ADSM-637, for CAIN, LISA L. |
|
October 26, 2009 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 12/14/2009 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/16/2009; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
|
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice TO COUNSEL WITH COURT DATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.