Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Unifund Ccr Partners, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Whealen , William Francis, against Riley , Josie F, represented by Cline , Thomas W, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 25, 2007 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties MUTUAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED. Associated Entries: 12/12/2007 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 12/12/2007 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/17/2008; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
|
December 12, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 12/13/2007; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Filed By: WILLIAM FRANCIS WHEALEN |
|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted/Sustained Filed By: JOHN B JACOBS JR |
|
December 12, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/17/2008 - Dismissed by Parties MUTUAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED. \n Scheduled For: 01/17/2008; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
|
December 12, 2007 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY TO COUNSEL OF RECORD WITH COURT DATE. | |
November 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 12/12/2007 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/13/2007; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
|
November 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled COUNSEL APPEARS Hearing Continued From: 11/01/2007; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
October 11, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 11/01/2007 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled COUNSEL APPEARS \n Scheduled For: 11/01/2007; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
|
October 11, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 10/11/2007; 9:00 AM Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.