Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Russo , John Otis filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Carpenter , Steve, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2006 |
CategoryCc Child Protection Act |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Certified copy of Order filed 10-17-06 was forward to the Ozark County Clerk and attorney Russo. |
|
October 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Order signed by Judge John Jacobs filed. | |
October 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filing: Petition for Order Approving Payment of Guardian Ad Litem Fee filed. Filed By: JOHN OTIS RUSSO |
|
September 25, 2006 | Docket Event |
Ord of Protection Served Document ID - 06-CP20-12; Served To - CARPENTER, STEVE; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 16-SEP-06; Served Time - 11:10:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - Member of Family Served |
|
September 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the Full Order was forward to petitioner and attorney Russo. |
|
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Protection Order Issued Document ID: 06-CP20-12, for CARPENTER, STEVE; Full Order of Child Protection issued and forward to the sheriff of Ozark County, Mo. for service. |
|
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 08/17/2006 - Child Prot Hrng Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 09/14/2006; 10:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judmt Full Order Protection Full Order of Child Protection entered and shall be effective until March 13, 2007, unless sooner terminated or renewed. Respondent shall pay to the Guardian ad Litem fees in the amount of $125.00. |
|
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Hearing held. Full Order to issue. G.A.L. fee assessed against Respondent. /s/ JJacobs |
|
September 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the Full Order was forward to the sheriff's office of Ozark County, Mo. for their records and MULES. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.