Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Corder , Sarah, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with MOODY, JOHN G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOODY, JOHN G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 03, 2006 |
CategoryCc Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeUncontested |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Publication Proof of Publication of Notice of Change of Name filed. |
|
April 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Two certified copies of said Judgment were forward to attorney Gross. |
|
April 05, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing Held Scheduled For: 04/05/2006; 9:00 AM ; JOHN G MOODY; Ozark |
|
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event | Uncontested | |
April 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment signed by Judge John Moody filed. It is ordered the Pet's name is changed to Sarah Joy Fay Swartz. |
|
March 31, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 04/05/2006 - Hearing Held \n Scheduled For: 04/05/2006; 9:00 AM ; JOHN G MOODY; Ozark |
|
March 03, 2006 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Circuit Ct |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.