Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ford Motor Credit Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Frankel , Irwin James, against Miller , Orval D, Milller , Brenda, represented by Russo , John Otis, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 07, 2006 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed CERTIFIED COPY TO DIVISION I Filed By: JOHN OTIS RUSSO |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT TO COUNSEL AND CIRCUIT CLERK |
|
March 20, 2007 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
March 19, 2007 | Docket Event |
Filing: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO MILLERS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW Filed By: IRWIN JAMES FRANKEL |
|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Filing: DEFENDANT'S REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW Filed By: JOHN OTIS RUSSO |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed PLAINTIFF'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note JUDGE'S ENTRY FAXED TO MR RUSSO AND MR MURPHY |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Held Scheduled For: 01/11/2007; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
|
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Tried by Court-Civil | |
January 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed ENTRY OF APPEARACNE BY PATRICK D MURPHY FOR PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.