Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
World Credit Fund Iii Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gamache , David Reid, against Roby , Angela M, represented by Russo , John Otis, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2006 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filing: Satisfaction of Judgment of Attorney fees Filed By: JOHN OTIS RUSSO |
|
September 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note JUDGMENT ENTERED ON ATTORNEY FEES. FAXED TO COUNSEL /s/ JJacobs Filed By: JOHN B JACOBS JR |
|
September 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filing: PLAINITIFF'S MOTION IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filing of Briefs BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES Filed By: JOHN OTIS RUSSO |
|
August 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note THIS ENTRY IS MADE TO COVER DOCKET CALL OF 8-17-06. MOTION HEARING HELD. PARTIES BY COUNSEL OF RECORD. DEFENDANT GIVEN UNTIL 8-28-06 TO BRIEF ISSUES. PLAINTIFF GIVEN UNTIL 9-22-06 TO BRIEF ISSUES. COURT WILL RULE IN CHAMBERS THEREAFTER. COUNSEL ARE REQUESTED TO FILE PROPOSED ORDERS. ENTRY FAXED TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. Filed By: JOHN B JACOBS JR |
|
August 16, 2006 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE |
|
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES Filed By: JOHN OTIS RUSSO |
|
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Associated Entries: 07/19/2006 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 07/19/2006 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/17/2006; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Assoc Div Ozark DO NOT USE |
|
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING AND CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Filed By: JOHN OTIS RUSSO |
|
August 15, 2006 | Docket Event |
Filing: LIMITED ENTRY OF APPEARANCE ON BEHALF OF PLAINTIFF FILED BY THOMAS W CLINE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.