Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Nilsen , Barbara, against Long , Jonathan M, in the jurisdiction of Osage County, MO, . Osage County, MO Superior Courts MO-Osage County with BRANDT, SONYA DAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRANDT, SONYA DAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsage County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Osage County |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
March 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
March 16, 2023 | Hearing | Consent Judgment | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Judmt/Dec Dis Filed | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Special Process Server | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Alias Summons Requested | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion Special Process Server |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.