Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding, Llc - 29601, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Myers , Edward J, against Streng , Jeremy Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Osage County, MO, . Osage County, MO Superior Courts MO-Osage County with BRANDT, SONYA DAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRANDT, SONYA DAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2022 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsage County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Osage County |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Req for Transcript Judgment | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court | |
December 08, 2022 | Hearing | Default Judgment | |
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Order - Special Process Server | |
October 14, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Associate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.