Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Des-Cont, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Snelling , Tony, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with STEELE, RUSSELL ELLIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSTEELE, RUSSELL ELLIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2022 |
CategoryCc Transcript Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeOther Final Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry along with a copy of the Satisfaction of Judgment was mailed to the Defendant | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: SARAH L LIPP |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT. Filed By: SARAH L LIPP \n Associated Entries: 01/05/2022 - Judgment Entered |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Associated Entries: 04/21/2022 - Satisfaction of Judgment Filed SATISFACTION OF JUDGEMENT. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Transcript Judgment Filed CERTIFICATE OF TAX ASSESSMENT. Filed By: SARAH L LIPP \n On Behalf Of: DES-CONT |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Other Final Disposition | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Info Sheet eFiling Filed By: SARAH L LIPP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.