Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Heiliger , Jordan Marie, against Lawson , Robert, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDINGTON, THOMAS P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 29, 2021 |
CategoryAc Contract-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 10/26/2021; 1:01 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal DISMISSAL; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JASON ROGER MITCHELL \n On Behalf Of: LVNV FUNDING LLC |
|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry along with a copy of Dismissal mailed to Robert Lawson. | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry and Webex Order mailed to Defendant. | |
October 12, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Continued for 10-26-2021 TPR Hearing Continued From: 10/12/2021; 1:01 PM Civil Setting |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Webex Order Filed By: THOMAS P. REDINGTON |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 10/19/2021 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 10/26/2021; 1:01 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Webex Order - enclosed in Notice of Entry Filed By: THOMAS P. REDINGTON |
|
September 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 09/28/2021; 1:01 PM Civil Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.