Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kirksville Missouri Hospital Co Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Mccormick , Matthew Ryan, against Brantner , Bonnie, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeREDINGTON, THOMAS P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Judgment Entered
Date: July 14, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Filed Voluntary Dismissal; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: KIRKSVILLE MISSOURI HOSPITAL CO LLC |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry along with a date stamped copy of Voluntary Dismissal was mailed to Bonnie Brantner on 07-13-2021. lg | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered File-date stamped copy of Consent Judgment given to Defendant immediately after Court. Filed By: BONNIE BRANTNER |
|
July 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Held "Consent Judgment entered per memo filed." TPR Filed By: THOMAS P. REDINGTON \n Scheduled For: 07/14/2020; 1:10 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry mailed to Defendant. A copy of Consent Judgment was given to Defendant immediatly after court. | |
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent Judgment $448.87 Judgment plus Costs. Filed By: BONNIE BRANTNER |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/14/2020 - Hearing Held "Consent Judgment entered per memo filed." TPR \n Scheduled For: 07/14/2020; 1:10 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
May 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled "Because of the Missouri Supreme Court's Order, of 3/22/20 and later extension, suspending Court appearances in most cases, for health and safety concerns, this case is continued to at 7/14/20 1:00 pm for review and/or re-setting. TPR" Filed By: THOMAS P. REDINGTON \n Hearing Continued From: 06/09/2020; 1:10 PM Civil Setting |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. Notice mailed to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.