Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mayfield , Joelle Marie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mayfield , Timothy D, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) with BENJAMIN F LEWIS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBENJAMIN F LEWIS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2023 |
CategoryCc Dissolution- W/ Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
Case Outcome TypeUncontested |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Retn Serv-Reg/Cert Mail Succs | |
March 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Withholding Order | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Sent | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed | |
March 20, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment on Dissolution | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Uncontested | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Cert of Dissolution Mailed | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.