Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
World Acceptance Corp Of Missouri, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Myers , Edward J, against Allen , Matthew B, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) with KOESTER, JULIA MEINERS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKOESTER, JULIA MEINERS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court | |
June 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Req for Transcript Judgment | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
June 01, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
May 05, 2023 | Hearing | Civil Setting Scheduled | |
May 04, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
March 17, 2023 | Hearing | Civil Setting Scheduled | |
March 17, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
March 07, 2023 | Hearing | Civil Setting Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.