Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sanchez , Armando, filed a(n) Ac Rent And Possession case represented by Bertrand , Frank C Iii, against Doe , John, Willis , Gloria, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) with KOESTER, JULIA MEINERS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKOESTER, JULIA MEINERS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryAc Rent And Possession |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Return Service-Writ Served | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Requested | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Writ Issued | |
February 14, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Sound Recording Log Sheet | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Tried by Court-Civil | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Judmt/Dec Dis Filed | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail-Undeliverable | |
February 02, 2023 | Hearing | Court Trial Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.