Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Saint Francis Medical Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Bailey , David H. Jr., against Repwest Insurance Co, in the jurisdiction of Cape Girardeau County, MO, . Cape Girardeau County, MO Superior Courts MO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) with KOESTER, JULIA MEINERS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKOESTER, JULIA MEINERS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryAc Contract/Account (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCape Girardeau County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Cape Girardeau (Jackson) |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
July 17, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
June 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Filed | |
June 22, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
June 22, 2023 | Hearing | Case Review Scheduled | |
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 22, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
May 22, 2023 | Hearing | Civil Setting Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.