Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rader , John, filed a(n) Pr Determination Of Heirship case in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HURST, BRETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHURST, BRETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2022 |
CategoryPr Determination Of Heirship |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeProbate Decree Of Heirship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Returned Mail-Undeliverable | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Publication | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Probate Decree of Heirship | |
June 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Determining Heirship | |
June 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed | |
June 09, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
June 09, 2022 | Docket Event | Sound Recording Log Sheet | |
May 24, 2022 | Hearing | Hearing Scheduled | |
May 06, 2022 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.