Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Wetzel , Eric Bryson, against Volker , Cheryl A, in the jurisdiction of Atchison County, MO, . Atchison County, MO Superior Courts MO-Atchison with HURST, BRETT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHURST, BRETT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2022 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationAtchison County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Atchison |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissed | |
March 09, 2023 | Hearing | Case Review Scheduled | |
March 09, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
February 07, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
February 02, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
February 02, 2023 | Hearing | Case Review Scheduled | |
January 10, 2023 | Hearing | Notice of Hearing Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.